There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding the firefight that occurred on March 4, 2007, between members of the United States Marine Corps and enemy forces in Bati Kot District, Nangarhar Province, Afghanistan.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/21/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
01/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
01/03/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/13/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/01/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/03/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 01/17/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Armed Services01/03/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities02/21/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.21.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.21. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) the Commandant of the U.S. Marine Corps should issue a public document certifying that members of Fox Company of the Marine Special Operations Command were not at fault in the firefight on March 4, 2007, with enemy forces in Bati Kot District, Nangarhar Province, Afghanistan; and (2) Fox Company marines involved in such incident deserve to have their names cleared.