There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding past genocides, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/22/2017Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/22/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (124)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/22/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 03/23/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/23/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/24/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/27/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/03/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/03/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 04/03/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/05/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 04/05/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 04/25/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/25/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/25/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 04/25/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/26/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/27/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/01/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 05/01/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/01/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/02/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 05/02/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/16/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/17/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 05/18/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/22/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/22/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/23/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/23/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/06/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/07/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 06/07/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/20/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/20/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/20/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/21/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/29/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/11/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/11/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/24/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 07/25/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 08/18/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 08/18/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 08/18/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/18/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 08/18/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/18/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/06/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/06/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/07/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 09/07/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/08/2017
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 09/08/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/08/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/11/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/11/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 09/11/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/12/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/13/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/13/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/13/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/13/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/13/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/13/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/13/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/13/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/13/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/21/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 09/21/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/21/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/21/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 09/21/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/21/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/21/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/21/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/26/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/26/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 09/26/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/27/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/03/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/05/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 10/05/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/10/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 10/23/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 10/23/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/24/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/25/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/25/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/01/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 11/15/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/28/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/04/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/18/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/18/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 12/18/2017
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 12/21/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 01/18/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 03/15/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/26/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 05/08/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/18/2018
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/12/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/11/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/05/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 09/26/2018
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/14/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/14/2018
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/27/2017 10/26/2017 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs03/22/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.220.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.220. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/22/2017)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that the United States, in seeking to prevent war crimes, crimes against humanity, and genocide against religious and ethnic groups in the Middle East, should draw upon relevant lessons of the U.S. government, civil society, and humanitarian response to the Armenian Genocide, Seyfo, and the broader genocidal campaign by the Ottoman Empire.