Text: H.Res.223 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/23/2017)

 
[Congressional Bills 115th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H. Res. 223 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






115th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 223

     Calling on the People's Republic of China (PRC) to cease its 
 retaliatory measures against the Republic of Korea in response to the 
 deployment of the U.S. Terminal High Altitude Area Defense (THAAD) to 
           U.S. Forces Korea (USFK), and for other purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             March 23, 2017

   Mr. Yoho (for himself, Mr. Marino, Mr. Kelly of Pennsylvania, Mr. 
Connolly, Mr. Rogers of Alabama, and Mr. Bera) submitted the following 
resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and 
  in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be 
subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration 
  of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee 
                               concerned

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
     Calling on the People's Republic of China (PRC) to cease its 
 retaliatory measures against the Republic of Korea in response to the 
 deployment of the U.S. Terminal High Altitude Area Defense (THAAD) to 
           U.S. Forces Korea (USFK), and for other purposes.

Whereas the United States-Republic of Korea (ROK) alliance constitutes a 
        lynchpin of United States foreign policy in maintaining peace and 
        security on the Korean Peninsula, in Northeast Asia and beyond;
Whereas the Democratic People's Republic of Korea (DPRK), also known as North 
        Korea, has continued engaging in destabilizing provocations by 
        developing and testing its nuclear and ballistic missile programs in 
        clear violation of six United Nations Security Council Resolutions;
Whereas, on March 5, 2017, North Korea launched four ballistic missiles from 
        Tongchang-ri, in northwest North Korea that flew an average of 620 miles 
        before falling into the sea between North Korea and Japan, following the 
        launch on February 11, 2017;
Whereas the 15-member United Nations Security Council issued a statement 
        condemning the March 5 missile launches as being ``in grave violation of 
        North Korea's international obligations'' under six relevant Security 
        Council resolutions;
Whereas the Republic of Korea and the United States made an alliance decision to 
        deploy the Terminal High Altitude Area Defense (THAAD) system to U.S. 
        Forces Korea (USFK) as a self-defensive measure to ensure the security 
        of the ROK and its people, and to protect Alliance military forces from 
        North Korea's growing weapons of mass destruction and ballistic missile 
        threats;
Whereas, on March 6, 2017, the first components of the THAAD anti-missile 
        system, including two launchers, arrived at Osan Air Base in the 
        Republic of Korea;
Whereas the Republic of Korea and the United States reiterated on numerous 
        occasions that the THAAD system would be deployed solely for the purpose 
        of defending against North Korean nuclear and missile threats and would 
        not be directed towards any third-party nations;
Whereas U.S. Pacific Command (PACOM) stated that ``North Korea's accelerating 
        program of nuclear weapons tests and ballistic missile launches 
        constitute a threat to international peace and security,'' and that the 
        THAAD battery is a ``strictly defensive capability'' and ``poses no 
        threat to other countries in the region'';
Whereas Hwang Kyo-Ahn, the Acting President of the Republic of Korea reiterated 
        the need for early deployment of THAAD and further stated that the 
        Government of the Republic of Korea would look aggressively for ``ways 
        to effectively strengthen the United States extended deterrence'' in 
        South Korea;
Whereas a spokesman for the Chinese Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Geng Shuang, 
        denounced the alliance's decision to deploy the THAAD system and vowed 
        that Beijing would ``take the necessary steps to safeguard our own 
        security interests'' further warning that the two countries should not 
        ``go further and further down the wrong road'';
Whereas China has engaged in unreasonable and inappropriate retaliatory measures 
        against the Republic of Korea, its businesses and its people in an 
        attempt to halt the deployment of THAAD;
Whereas no less than fifty-five Lotte supermarkets across China had been shut 
        down and the Korean businesses located across China have been the target 
        of various inspections by the Chinese authorities following the Lotte 
        Group's swap of a golf course in Seongju for the THAAD battery site;
Whereas an American company partnering with Lotte has also been directly 
        affected by these measures;
Whereas travel industry sources in China said they were instructed by the 
        Chinese authorities not to sell any tour packages to South Korea, both 
        group and individual, effective March 15, 2017;
Whereas Secretary of State Rex Tillerson stated on March 17, 2017, that this 
        ``is not the way for a regional power to help resolve what is a serious 
        threat to everyone,'' and that ``we urge China to address the threat 
        that makes it necessary, that being the escalating threat from North 
        Korea'';
Whereas China cancelled numerous cultural shows and music performances agreed to 
        and under contract with agencies and companies from the Republic of 
        Korea;
Whereas China's retaliatory measures against South Korea potentially constitutes 
        a violation of its World Trade Organization (WTO) obligations; and
Whereas China's retaliatory measures against South Korea in an attempt to block 
        the implementation of THAAD is unacceptable: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) condemns North Korea's recent ballistic missile tests 
        and its announcement of being ``in the final stages'' of a 
        potential Intercontinental ballistic missile (ICBM) test;
            (2) urges the United States Government to take all 
        necessary measures to protect its citizens and allies in the 
        region and closely cooperate with the international community 
        to eliminate North Korea's nuclear and ballistic missile 
        programs.
            (3) supports the prompt deployment of the THAAD system to 
        counter the North Korean threat and welcomes the arrival of its 
        first elements into USFK in the Republic of Korea;
            (4) commends the Government of the Republic of Korea for 
        its firm commitment and timely cooperation to ensure the 
        effective deployment of THAAD;
            (5) condemns China's retaliatory measures against the 
        Republic of Korea, its businesses and its people in response to 
        the deployment of the THAAD to protect against North Korea;
            (6) urges the Chinese government to immediately cease its 
        diplomatic intimidation and economic coercion against the 
        Republic of Korea in an attempt to block the THAAD deployment; 
        and
            (7) calls on the Chinese government to exercise its 
        considerable influence to pressure North Korea to give up its 
        nuclear and ballistic missile programs instead of undermining 
        South Korea's sovereign right to defend itself against the 
        North Korean threat.
                                 <all>