There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives and reaffirming long-standing United States policy in support of a negotiated two-state solution to the Israeli-Palestinian conflict.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/05/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
01/05/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/05/2017 Introduced in House

Cosponsors (115)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 01/05/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/05/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 01/05/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/05/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/10/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 01/10/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/10/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/10/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/10/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 01/10/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 01/10/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/10/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/10/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/13/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/13/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/01/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/01/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/13/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/05/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 10/19/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.23 - Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives and reaffirming long-standing United States policy in support of a negotiated two-state solution to the Israeli-Palestinian conflict..

Subjects (8)

  • Arab-Israeli relations
  • Conflicts and wars
  • Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
  • Israel
  • Middle East
  • Palestinians
  • United Nations

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.23. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/05/2017)

Declares that a viable and sustainable two-state solution to resolve the Israeli-Palestinian conflict can only be achieved through direct negotiations between Israelis and Palestinians.

Calls for the United States to continue to:

  • support a durable and sustainable two-state solution;
  • oppose, and if necessary, veto future United Nations Security Council resolutions that seek to impose solutions to final status issues or that are one-sided and anti-Israel; and
  • work with Israelis and Palestinians to create the conditions for successful final-status peace negotiations.