There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House that more should be done to instill Holocaust education in school curricula around the country.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/25/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/25/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5]* 04/25/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/02/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/02/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/02/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/16/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/16/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/16/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 05/22/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/22/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/22/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 05/23/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/24/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/24/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/07/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/07/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/07/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/15/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/20/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/20/2017
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/20/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/11/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/11/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 07/11/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 07/11/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/11/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/07/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/08/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 10/03/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/03/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/23/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/15/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 11/15/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/15/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/29/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 12/06/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/11/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/17/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/02/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 02/02/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce04/25/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs04/25/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.276.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.276. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/25/2017)

Commends Holocaust education activists on their efforts to include Holocaust education in states' public school curricula.

Urges more states to enact legislation mandating Holocaust education in their schools.

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that more should be done to instill in the nation's future the promise that we will never forget the horrors of the Holocaust and must always work to prevent such atrocities from occurring in the future.