There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Directing certain officials of the executive branch to provide information to the House of Representatives that will enable the House to meet its constitutional responsibility to conduct oversight of the executive branch by investigating potential conflicts of interests of President Donald J. Trump.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
05/23/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
04/27/2017Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2017Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2017Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2017Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2017Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/27/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/26/2017

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform04/27/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/27/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/27/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management05/23/2017 Referred to
House Rules04/27/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.286.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.286. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/27/2017)

Declares that the House of Representatives directs President Trump to: (1) transmit to the House of Representatives copies of any document, correspondence, or other communication in possession of the Executive Office of the President that refers or relates to his proposal to maintain an interest in his business holdings while turning over day-to-day operation of those interests to his sons Donald J. Trump, Jr., and Eric Trump; and (2) provide visitor logs for the White House and Mar-A-Lago to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. Requires such committee to hold ongoing votes on reporting the logs' contents to the full House.

Directs: (1) the Department of the Treasury to provide the House Committee on Ways and Means with the tax return information of Donald J. Trump for tax years 2007 through 2016 for review in closed executive session, and (2) such committee to hold a vote on reporting such information to the full House.

Directs the Office on Government Ethics to publish any waiver or exception granted to any federal officer or employee to the January 28, 2017, executive order entitled "Ethics Commitments by Executive Branch Appointees."

Directs the General Services Administration to provide the oversight committee with any legal analysis supporting its March 23, 2017, conclusion that Trump International Hotel in Washington, DC may maintain its lease with the federal government, despite an express prohibition on elected officials taking part in the lease.