There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the designation of the week of April 30, 2017, through May 6, 2017, as "National Small Business Week" to honor the vital role of small business and the passion of entrepreneurs in the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/28/2017Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
04/28/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 04/28/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 04/28/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/01/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/01/2017
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/02/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business04/28/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.295. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/2017)

Supports: (1) the designation of National Small Business Week, (2) efforts to encourage consumers to shop locally, and (3) efforts to increase awareness of the value of locally owned small businesses and the impact of locally owned small business on the U.S. economy.

Honors the vital role of small business and entrepreneurs in the United States during such week.

Recognizes: (1) the important role of the Small Business Administration as a valuable resource for the U.S. entrepreneur, (2) the importance of creating policies that promote a business friendly environment for small business owners free of unnecessary regulations, and (3) the National Small Business Person of the Year and the National Lender of the Year.

Encourages young entrepreneurs to pursue their passions and create more start-up businesses.