There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives relating to protecting freedom of speech, thought, and expression at institutions of higher education.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
05/11/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
05/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/03/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/03/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 05/04/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/16/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 05/24/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 06/08/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 06/12/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 06/14/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/23/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 06/26/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/27/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 06/29/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/29/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 07/11/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 07/11/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/19/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 08/08/2017
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 08/08/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 10/06/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/16/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 10/23/2017
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 10/24/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/31/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/31/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 10/31/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/01/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 11/01/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/01/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 11/01/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 11/09/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/29/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/29/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 01/22/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 03/05/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 03/20/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/18/2018
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/26/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary05/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice05/11/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.307.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.307. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/03/2017)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that free speech zones and restrictive speech codes are inherently at odds with the freedom of speech guaranteed by the First Amendment of the Constitution. Urges institutions of higher education to facilitate and recommit themselves to protecting the free and open exchange of ideas.