There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Calling for the unconditional release of United States citizens and legal permanent resident aliens being held for political purposes by the Government of Iran.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6332)
05/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
07/26/2017-3:10pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/26/2017-3:10pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6332)
07/26/2017-2:41pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 317.
07/26/2017-2:41pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6331-6335)
07/26/2017-2:41pmMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
06/29/2017Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
06/29/2017Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/18/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa.
05/04/2017Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/04/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 05/04/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/07/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/08/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/08/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/08/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/12/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/13/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/15/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 06/15/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/20/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/20/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/20/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/20/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/23/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/23/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/23/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/23/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/23/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/23/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/23/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/26/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 06/26/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/28/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/28/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/28/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/28/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/28/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/29/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/29/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 07/14/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/20/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/24/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 07/24/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/25/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/26/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/26/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/26/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/26/2017
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/26/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/04/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa05/18/2017 Referred to
06/29/2017 Markup by
06/29/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.317. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/26/2017)

Calls on the government of Iran to: (1) release Siamak Namazi, Baquer Namazi, Xiyue Wang, Nizar Zakka, and any other U.S. citizen, legal permanent resident alien, or foreign national being unjustly detained in Iran; and (2) fulfill its promises to assist in locating and returning Robert Levinson.

Encourages the President to: (1) take meaningful action to secure the release of such individuals if Iran does not do so, and (2) make the release of U.S. citizens and legal permanent resident aliens held hostage by the Iranian government the highest of priorities.

Requests the United States and its allies whose nationals have been detained to consider establishing a multinational task force to secure the release of the detainees.