There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the importance of vaccinations and immunizations in the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/19/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
05/16/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/16/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/16/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/16/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/16/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/18/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/18/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/18/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/18/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/18/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/18/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/14/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/14/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/14/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/14/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/14/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/14/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 06/14/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/14/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/14/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/28/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/11/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 11/08/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce05/16/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/19/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.327.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.327. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/16/2017)

Commends the international community, health organizations, the private sector, school and community leaders, and faith-based organizations for bolstering health through vaccination.

Recognizes that the lack of vaccination can cause a public health crisis and that there is no credible evidence that vaccines cause life-threatening or disabling diseases in healthy children or adults.

Encourages a continued commitment to research to improve vaccines and develop new vaccines.

Urges parents to follow the scientific evidence and consensus of medical experts in favor of timely vaccinations to protect their children and their community.