There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the contributions of senior volunteers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/19/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/19/2017Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
05/19/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/19/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 05/19/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/19/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/22/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 05/22/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/22/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/06/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 07/27/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 03/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce05/19/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.344. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/19/2017)

Encourages the people of the United States to recognize the contributions of senior volunteers and join in the celebration of National Senior Corps Week.

Supports adequately funding and growing the proven Senior Corps programs.