There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning the violence and persecution in Chechnya.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/27/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5214)
05/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
06/27/2017-3:45pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/27/2017-3:45pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5214)
06/27/2017-3:25pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 351.
06/27/2017-3:25pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5214-5217)
06/27/2017-3:25pmMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
05/25/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/25/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/23/2017Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/23/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/23/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 05/23/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/24/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/24/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/24/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/24/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/24/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/24/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 05/24/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/24/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 05/24/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 05/24/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/24/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/24/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/24/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/24/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 05/24/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/24/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/24/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 05/24/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/24/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/25/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/25/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/25/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/25/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/25/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/25/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/25/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/25/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 05/25/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 05/25/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/25/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/25/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/25/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/25/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/06/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/06/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/06/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/06/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/06/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/06/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/06/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 06/07/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/13/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/13/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/20/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/22/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/22/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 06/26/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 06/27/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/23/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.351. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/27/2017)

Condemns the violence and persecution in Chechnya.

Calls on:

  • Chechen officials to cease the abduction, detention, and torture of individuals on the basis of their sexual orientation and hold accountable those involved in perpetrating such abuses;
  • the government of the Russian Federation to protect the human rights of all its citizens, condemn the violence and persecution, investigate such crimes in Chechnya, and hold accountable those involved in perpetrating such abuses; and
  • the U.S. government to continue to condemn the violence and persecution in Chechnya, demand the release of individuals wrongfully detained, and identify those individuals whose involvement in this violence qualifies for the imposition of sanctions under the Sergei Magnitsky Rule of Law Accountability Act of 2012 or the Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act.

Affirms that the rights to freedom of assembly, association, and expression and freedom from extrajudicial detention and violence are universal human rights and that countries that fail to respect these rights jeopardize the security and prosperity of all their citizens.