There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Reaffirming the strategic partnership between the United States and Canada, recognizing bilateral cooperation that advances United States national interests, and urging increased bilateral cooperation on security, economic issues, and energy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
05/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date
12/12/2017-4:07pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/12/2017-4:07pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9826)
12/12/2017-3:56pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 357.
12/12/2017-3:56pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9826-9828)
12/12/2017-3:55pmMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
07/27/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/27/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/27/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
05/26/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
05/25/2017Referred to House Ways and Means
05/25/2017Referred to House Foreign Affairs
05/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/25/2017Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/25/2017 Referred to
07/27/2017 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere06/27/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/25/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade05/26/2017 Referred to

As of 04/20/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.357 - Reaffirming the strategic partnership between the United States and Canada, recognizing bilateral cooperation that advances United States national interests, and urging increased bilateral cooperation on security, economic issues, and energy, and for other purposes..


Subjects (10)

  • Alternative and renewable resources
  • Arctic and polar regions
  • Canada
  • Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
  • Computer security and identity theft
  • Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
  • Energy storage, supplies, demand
  • Military assistance, sales, and agreements
  • Oil and gas

Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.357. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/12/2017)

Reaffirms the commitment of the House of Representatives to the U.S.-Canadian partnership.

Supports: (1) stronger trade relations with Canada and the creation of more American jobs, and (2) an increased focus on energy security through greater energy infrastructure integration.

Encourages greater security collaboration in the areas of defense, border security, cyber-security, and Arctic security.