There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 2910) to provide for Federal and State agency coordination in the approval of certain authorizations under the Natural Gas Act, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 2883) to establish a more uniform, transparent, and modern process to authorize the construction, connection, operation, and maintenance of international border-crossing facilities for the import and export of oil and natural gas and the transmission of electricity; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 218) to provide for the exchange of Federal land and non-Federal land in the State of Alaska for the construction of a road between King Cove and Cold Bay; and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/19/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 194 (Roll no. 394).(text: CR H5991-5992)
07/18/2017The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-235, by Ms. Cheney.
07/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
07/19/2017-2:23pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/19/2017-2:23pmOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 194 (Roll no. 394). (text: CR H5991-5992)
07/19/2017-2:11pmOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 236 - 192 (Roll no. 393). (consideration: CR H5999-6000)
07/19/2017-2:02pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5999-6001)
07/19/2017-1:23pmPOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 454, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question, and by voice vote announced that the ayes prevailed. Ms. Slaughter demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of ordering the previous question until later in the legislative day.
07/19/2017-12:43pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 454.
07/19/2017-12:35pmConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5991-5997)
07/18/2017Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 66.
07/18/2017-5:59pmThe resolution makes in order at anytime on the legislative day of July 20, 2017, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules, relating to the bill H.R. 2825. Also the rule provides that the Committee on Appropriations may at any time before 5 p.m. on Friday, July 21, 2017, file privileged reports to accompany measures making appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2018.
07/18/2017The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-235, by Ms. Cheney.

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules07/18/2017 Reported original measure H. Rept. 115-235

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.454. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/18/2017)

Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.R. 2910) to provide for Federal and State agency coordination in the approval of certain authorizations under the Natural Gas Act, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 2883) to establish a more uniform, transparent, and modern process to authorize the construction, connection, operation, and maintenance of international border-crossing facilities for the import and export of oil and natural gas and the transmission of electricity; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 218) to provide for the exchange of Federal land and non-Federal land in the State of Alaska for the construction of a road between King Cove and Cold Bay.