There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the role of the United States in promoting children's access to quality education in the poorest countries through the Global Partnership for Education.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
07/20/2017Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
07/20/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 07/20/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/25/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/25/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/25/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 07/25/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/28/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/28/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/28/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/28/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/28/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/28/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/28/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 08/04/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 08/04/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 08/04/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 08/04/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/25/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 08/25/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 09/06/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/06/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/06/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/11/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/11/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/11/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/11/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/12/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/12/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/12/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/12/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 09/18/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/03/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 10/03/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/05/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/05/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/23/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/23/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/23/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/23/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/23/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/23/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/23/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 10/24/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/24/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/24/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/24/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 10/24/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/24/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/24/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/24/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 10/26/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 11/01/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/01/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/14/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 11/14/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 11/14/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 11/14/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/14/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 11/14/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/15/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 11/15/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/15/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/16/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/16/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/16/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/28/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/28/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 11/30/2017
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/30/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/06/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 12/06/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 12/07/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/07/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/11/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 12/11/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/13/2017
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/15/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/15/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 12/19/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/19/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 12/19/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/21/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 12/21/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/09/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/09/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 01/09/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 01/09/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/09/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/16/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/16/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 01/17/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 01/17/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 01/19/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/19/2018
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/29/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 01/29/2018
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/29/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/30/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 01/30/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 02/05/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/05/2018
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/06/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/06/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/06/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/06/2018
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/08/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/08/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/14/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/15/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs07/20/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.466. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/20/2017)

Affirms U.S. leadership and commitment to improving access to quality education for the poorest and most marginalized children and youth worldwide.

Supports the mission and goals of the Global Partnership for Education (GPE) to mobilize global and national efforts to contribute to the achievement of equitable, quality education and learning.

Recognizes that U.S. investments in bilateral basic education are complemented by GPE's education systems approach and convening authority.

Encourages continued commitment and investments by the U.S. government, international donors, private foundations, and private sector donors through the GPE to the global effort to promote children and youth attending school.