There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the seriousness of Polycystic Ovary Syndrome (PCOS) and expressing support for the designation of the month of September 2017 as "PCOS Awareness Month".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
08/04/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
07/28/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/28/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 07/28/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 08/01/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 08/04/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/05/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/12/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/12/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/12/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/12/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/12/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/12/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/13/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 09/14/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/25/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/26/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/26/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/28/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 09/28/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/28/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 10/04/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/04/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/04/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 10/12/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 10/12/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 10/23/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/31/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/01/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/02/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/02/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/02/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/02/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 11/03/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/06/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/07/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/13/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 11/13/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 11/16/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 11/30/2017
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 11/30/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 11/30/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/06/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 12/06/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 12/06/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/07/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/14/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/18/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/16/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce07/28/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health08/04/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.495. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/28/2017)

Expresses support for the goals and ideals of Polycystic Ovary Syndrome (PCOS) Awareness Month. (PCOS is caused by a hormone imbalance. Symptoms can include infertility, weight gain, excess hair growth, and acne.)

Recognizes the need for further research, improved treatment and care options, and a cure for PCOS.

Acknowledges the struggles affecting all women and girls afflicted with PCOS.