There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning and censuring President Donald Trump.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
08/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
08/18/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
08/18/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (134)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 08/18/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 08/18/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 08/18/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 08/18/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 08/18/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 08/25/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 08/25/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 08/25/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 08/25/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/25/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 08/25/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/25/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 08/25/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/25/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/25/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 08/25/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 08/25/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/25/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 08/25/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 08/25/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 08/25/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 08/25/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 08/25/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 08/25/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/25/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/25/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 08/25/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 08/25/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 08/25/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/25/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 08/25/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 08/25/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/25/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 08/25/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 08/25/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 08/25/2017
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 08/25/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 08/25/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/25/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 08/25/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/25/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 08/25/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 08/25/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/25/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 08/25/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 08/29/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 08/29/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 08/29/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 08/29/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/29/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 08/29/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/01/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/01/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/01/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 09/05/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/06/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/06/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/07/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/07/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 09/08/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/18/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary08/18/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.496.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.496. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/18/2017)

Censures and condemns President Trump for his inadequate response to the violence in Charlottesville, Virginia, on August 12, 2017, for his failure to condemn the White supremacist groups responsible for actions of domestic terrorism, for asserting that "both sides" were to blame and excusing the violent behavior of participants in the Unite the Right rally, and for employing people with ties to White supremacist movements in the White House.

Urges President Trump to fire all White House advisors who have urged him to cater to the White supremacist movement.