There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the symbols and traditions of Christmas should be protected for use by those who celebrate Christmas.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/30/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
11/30/2017Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
11/30/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 11/30/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 11/30/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 11/30/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/04/2017
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 12/07/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 12/20/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 12/17/2018
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/17/2018
Rep. Hern, Kevin [R-OK-1] 12/17/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/17/2018
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/17/2018
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/17/2018
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 12/17/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 12/17/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 12/17/2018
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 12/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform11/30/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.637.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.637. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/30/2017)

Recognizes the importance of Christmas symbols and traditions.

Disapproves of attempts to ban references to Christmas.

Expresses support for the use of these symbols and traditions by those who celebrate Christmas.