There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing concern over attacks on Coptic Christians in Egypt.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/21/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/11/2018Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H165-166)
12/21/2017Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
12/21/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 12/21/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 12/21/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/10/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 01/11/2018
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/11/2018
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 01/11/2018
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/11/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/11/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/11/2018
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/11/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 01/11/2018
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/11/2018
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/11/2018
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/11/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/11/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 01/11/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/11/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/11/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 01/11/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/16/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/16/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/17/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 01/17/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 01/17/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/19/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 01/29/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/29/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 01/30/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/14/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 02/27/2018
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 03/15/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/22/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 04/10/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/10/2018
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 04/12/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/23/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/06/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/20/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/27/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/27/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/10/2018
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 07/10/2018
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 07/13/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/17/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 09/04/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/04/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/04/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 09/05/2018
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/12/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 09/12/2018
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 11/02/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs12/21/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.673.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.673. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/21/2017)

Acknowledges: (1) the importance of the U.S.-Egypt partnership in advancing common interests, and (2) Egypt's regional role as a partner in the fight against terrorism and violent extremism.

Recognizes the necessity for Egypt's leaders to take steps toward education reform that prioritizes impartial instruction of all religions and political reform that prioritizes human rights, fundamental freedoms, and the rule of law.

Urges the government of Egypt to: (1) enact reforms to ensure that Coptic Christians are given the same rights and opportunities as all other Egyptian citizens; (2) end the culture of impunity for attacks on Christians; and (3) arrest, prosecute, and convict individuals who carry out such attacks.