There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for designation of the 17th day in May as "DIPG Awareness Day" to raise awareness and encourage the research into cures for diffuse intrinsic pontine glioma (DIPG) and pediatric cancers in general.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/30/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/03/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
01/30/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/30/2017Introduced in House

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/30/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 01/30/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/02/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/09/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 03/09/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/20/2017
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/20/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/01/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/01/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/03/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/17/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/12/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/12/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/05/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 12/07/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/07/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 12/13/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/14/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/19/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/12/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 04/24/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/24/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 04/24/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/24/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/27/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/08/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 05/15/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/16/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/22/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/13/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/26/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 07/25/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/12/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/12/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/17/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 09/17/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/25/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/09/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/23/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/23/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/11/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/11/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/11/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 12/20/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/30/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health02/03/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.69.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.69. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/30/2017)

Expresses support for the designation of DIPG Awareness Day. ("DIPG" is diffuse intrinsic pontine glioma, a terminal childhood brain cancer.)

Encourages the National Cancer Institute and other research funders to elevate their consideration of the mortality rate of a type of cancer as well as the life years lost as factors considered during the grant application process.