There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting robust relations with the State of Israel bilaterally and in multilateral fora upon seventy years of statehood, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/10/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
05/10/2018Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.(consideration: CR H3912-3913; text of measure as reported in House: CR H3912-3913)
04/18/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
05/10/2018-11:36amOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.
05/10/2018-11:36amMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/10/2018-11:36amH.Amdt.583 On agreeing to the Royce (CA) amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
05/10/2018-11:35amH.Amdt.583 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Royce (CA). (consideration: CR H3913; text: CR H3913)
05/10/2018-11:34amH.Amdt.582 On agreeing to the Royce (CA) amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
05/10/2018-11:33amH.Amdt.582 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Royce (CA). (consideration: CR H3913; text: CR H3913)
05/10/2018Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. (consideration: CR H3912-3913; text of measure as reported in House: CR H3912-3913)
05/10/2018-11:33amMr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
04/18/2018Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
04/18/2018Introduced in House

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 04/18/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/18/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 04/18/2018
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/24/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 04/24/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/24/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 04/24/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 04/24/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/24/2018
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/24/2018
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/24/2018
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/24/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/24/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 04/24/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/24/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/25/2018
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 04/25/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/25/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 04/25/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/25/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/25/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/25/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/25/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/25/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 04/25/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/26/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 04/26/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 04/26/2018
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/26/2018
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 04/26/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/26/2018
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/26/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/26/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/27/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/27/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 04/27/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/27/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/01/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/01/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/01/2018
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/01/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/07/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/07/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/07/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/07/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 05/07/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/07/2018
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 05/07/2018
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/07/2018
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/07/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/07/2018
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 05/08/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/08/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/08/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 05/08/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 05/09/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/09/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/09/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/09/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/18/2018 Referred to
05/10/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.835. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/10/2018)

Encourages equitable treatment of Israel in international fora and the diplomatic recognition of Israel from governments worldwide.

Reiterates support for a negotiated Israeli-Palestinian settlement leading to a two-state solution.