There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing the seriousness of Polycystic Ovary Syndrome (PCOS) and expressing support for the designation of the month of September 2018 as "PCOS Awareness Month".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/27/2018Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/27/2018Introduced in House

Cosponsors (123)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 04/27/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6]* 04/27/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/07/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/07/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 05/07/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/24/2018
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/24/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/24/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/06/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/06/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/06/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/06/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/08/2018
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/08/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/28/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/28/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/28/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/28/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/28/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/10/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/10/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/10/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 07/10/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 07/10/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/10/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/10/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/11/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/11/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/17/2018
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/18/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/19/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/23/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 07/23/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/23/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/24/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/24/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 07/26/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/26/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/26/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/26/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 07/26/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/04/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/04/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 09/04/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/04/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/04/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/04/2018
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/04/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/04/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/04/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 09/04/2018
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/04/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 09/04/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/04/2018
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 09/05/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/05/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/05/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/05/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/05/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/05/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/05/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/05/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/05/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 09/06/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 09/06/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/06/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/06/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 09/06/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/07/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/07/2018
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/12/2018
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/12/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/12/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/12/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/12/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/12/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/25/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/25/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 09/28/2018
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 09/28/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/05/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/05/2018
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/05/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/05/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 10/05/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/05/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 10/19/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 10/30/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/27/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.864. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/27/2018)

Expresses support for the goals and ideals of Polycystic Ovary Syndrome (PCOS) Awareness Month. (PCOS is caused by a hormone imbalance. Symptoms can include infertility, weight gain, excess hair growth, and acne.)

Recognizes the need for further research, improved treatment and care options, and a cure for PCOS.

Acknowledges the struggles affecting all women and girls afflicted with PCOS.