There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the goals and ideals of June 1 through June 3, 2018 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Weekend" and June 2018 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month".


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/24/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/05/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
05/24/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
05/24/2018Introduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/24/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 05/24/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/01/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/01/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/01/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 06/01/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/07/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 06/07/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/07/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/07/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/07/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/19/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary05/24/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations06/05/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.913. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/24/2018)

Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Gun Violence Awareness Month and National Gun Violence Awareness Weekend.