There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To acknowledge that the War on Drugs has been a failed policy in achieving the goal of reducing drug use, and for the House of Representatives to apologize to the individuals and communities that were victimized by this policy.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/30/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
06/12/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/12/2018Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/12/2018Introduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/12/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/12/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/13/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 06/13/2018
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/13/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/13/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 06/13/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/13/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/13/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/13/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/13/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/14/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/12/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary06/12/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations07/30/2018 Referred to

As of 12/16/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.Res.933 - To acknowledge that the War on Drugs has been a failed policy in achieving the goal of reducing drug use, and for the House of Representatives to apologize to the individuals and communities that were victimized by this policy..


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.933. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/12/2018)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that the War on Drugs has failed to achieve its goal of reducing drug use.

Apologizes to those harmed through the War on Drugs.