There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Supporting the officers and personnel who carry out the important mission of the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/18/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 244 - 35, 133 Present (Roll no. 337).
07/11/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
07/18/2018-3:31pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/18/2018-3:31pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 244 - 35, 133 Present (Roll no. 337). (text: CR H6486-6487)
07/18/2018-3:22pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6495)
07/18/2018-2:50pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/18/2018-1:47pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 990.
07/18/2018-1:47pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6486-6493)
07/18/2018-1:47pmMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
07/12/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
07/11/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
07/11/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/11/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/11/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/11/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/11/2018Introduced in House

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 07/11/2018
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22]* 07/11/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 07/11/2018
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16]* 07/11/2018
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/12/2018
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/12/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/12/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/12/2018
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 07/13/2018
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 07/13/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/16/2018
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/16/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/16/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/16/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 07/16/2018
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 07/16/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 07/16/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/17/2018
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/17/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/17/2018
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/17/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 07/17/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/17/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/18/2018
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 07/18/2018
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/18/2018
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/18/2018

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary07/11/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security07/11/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/11/2018 Referred to
House Homeland Security07/11/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services07/11/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel07/12/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.990. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/18/2018)

Expresses support for U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) officers and personnel and denounces calls for ICE's abolishment.