There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Suicide Hotline Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Suicide Hotline Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

National Suicide Hotline Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Federal Communications Commission to study the feasibility of designating a simple, easy-to-remember dialing code to be used for a national suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline system.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
03/13/2018By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 115-213.
11/07/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7069; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7069)
10/31/2017Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/03/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
03/13/2018SenateBy Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 115-213.
11/10/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/08/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/08/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/08/2017-12:32pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/08/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/08/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/07/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7069; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7069)
10/31/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 256.
10/31/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/04/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/03/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2723-2724)

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 05/03/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 06/08/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/19/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/11/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/28/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/04/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/17/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/03/2017 Referred to
10/04/2017 Markup by
10/31/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-213
House Energy and Commerce11/08/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology11/10/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs11/08/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health11/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1015. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/07/2017)

National Suicide Hotline Improvement Act of 2017

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to coordinate with the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration (SAMHSA) and the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to examine: (1) the feasibility of designating a three-digit dialing code for a national suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline system; and (2) the effectiveness of the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline (1-800-273-TALK), including how well it addresses the needs of veterans.

SAMHSA must report to the FCC: (1) the potential impact of a designated dialing code on suicide prevention, crisis services, and other suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotlines; and (2) recommendations for improving the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline.  

The VA must report to the FCC about how well the National Suicide Prevention Lifeline and the Veterans Crisis Line are working to address the needs of veterans.

The FCC must report to Congress whether it recommends a dialing code, a cost-benefit analysis comparing the three-digit code to the current lifeline number, and cost estimates for service providers, states, and localities.