There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

RAISE Family Caregivers Act
Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

RAISE Family Caregivers Act
Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

RAISE Family Caregivers Act
Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to provide for the establishment and maintenance of a Family Caregiving Strategy, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the establishment and maintenance of a National Family Caregiving Strategy, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6139-6140)
05/11/2017Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report.
05/03/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/27/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
09/27/2017-3:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/27/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/26/2017SenateS.Amdt.1102 Amendment SA 1102 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2017SenateS.Amdt.1102 Amendment SA 1102 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S6140) To amend the title.
09/26/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6139-6140)
09/26/2017SenateS.Amdt.1101 Amendment SA 1101 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2017SenateS.Amdt.1101 Amendment SA 1101 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S6139-6140; text: CR S6139-6140) In the nature of a substitute.
09/26/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6143)
06/14/2017SenateSpecial Committee on Aging. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-364.
05/11/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 78.
05/11/2017SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report.
05/11/2017SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/03/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2724)

Cosponsors (15)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/03/2017 Referred to
05/11/2017 Markup by
05/11/2017 Reported by
House Education and the Workforce09/27/2017 Referred to
Senate Aging (Special)06/14/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1028. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/26/2017)

Recognize, Assist, Include, Support, and Engage Family Caregivers Act of 2017 or the RAISE Family Caregivers Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to develop and make publicly available a National Family Caregiving Strategy that identifies recommended actions for recognizing and supporting family caregivers in a manner that reflects their diverse needs.

(Sec. 4) HHS shall convene a Family Caregiving Advisory Council to advise the department on recognizing and supporting family caregivers.

(Sec. 6) The council shall terminate after five years.