There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Administrator of the Small Business Administration to submit to Congress a report on the utilization of small businesses with respect to certain Federal contracts.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/02/2017Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/04/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
08/02/2017Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 198.
Action By: Senate
08/02/2017Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship
08/02/2017Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship
05/04/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/04/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/08/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 08/01/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship05/04/2017 Referred to
08/02/2017 Markup by
08/02/2017 Reported by

As of 07/22/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.1038 - A bill to require the Administrator of the Small Business Administration to submit to Congress a report on the utilization of small businesses with respect to certain Federal contracts..


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1038. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (08/02/2017)

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Small Business Administration (SBA) to report to specified congressional committees on determinations as to:

  • whether small business concerns and each category of covered small business concerns (specified below) are being utilized in a significant portion of the federal market on multiple award contracts, including whether awards are being reserved for one or more of those categories and whether each such category is being given the opportunity to perform on such contracts; and
  • whether current performance requirements for such contracts are feasible and appropriate for small business concerns.

The term "covered small business concerns" means:

  • HUBZone small business concerns,
  • small business concerns owned and controlled by service-disabled veterans,
  • small business concerns owned and controlled by women, and
  • socially and economically disadvantaged small business concerns receiving SBA procurement contracts.

In making such determinations, the SBA shall use information from multiple award contracts: (1) with varied assigned North American Industry Classification System codes, and (2) that were awarded by at least eight federal agencies.