There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Chinese-American World War II Veteran Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Chinese-American World War II Veteran Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Chinese-American World War II Veteran Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Chinese-American World War II Veteran Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the Chinese-American Veterans of World War II, in recognition of their dedicated service during World War II.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
12/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-337. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2018Signed by President.
12/20/2018Presented to President.
12/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H10156-10157)
12/12/2018Committee on House Administration discharged.
12/12/2018Committee on Financial Services discharged.
09/12/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/12/2018Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/04/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
12/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-337. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2018Signed by President.
12/20/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/12/2018-4:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/12/2018-4:24pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10156-10157)
12/12/2018-4:24pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10156-10157)
12/12/2018HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
12/12/2018HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
12/12/2018-4:24pmHouseMr. Barr asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/17/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/17/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/17/2018-1:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/17/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/12/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/12/2018SenateS.Amdt.4015 Amendment SA 4015 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/12/2018SenateS.Amdt.4015 Amendment SA 4015 proposed by Senator Flake for Senator Duckworth. (consideration: CR S6152-6153; text: CR S6152-6153) In the nature of a substitute.
09/12/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6152-6153)
09/12/2018SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/04/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/04/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/08/2017
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/24/2017
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/07/2017
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/07/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/12/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/22/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/12/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/13/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/19/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/31/2017
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 09/05/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/06/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/11/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/12/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 09/12/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/14/2017
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/19/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/26/2017
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 10/02/2017
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/05/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 10/18/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 10/18/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/08/2017
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 11/28/2017
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 12/05/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 01/03/2018
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 01/16/2018
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/12/2018
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/13/2018
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/13/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 02/14/2018
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 02/14/2018
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/26/2018
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 02/26/2018
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 02/26/2018
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/07/2018
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/20/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/20/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/19/2018
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/19/2018
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/19/2018
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/26/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 04/26/2018
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 04/26/2018
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/16/2018
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/16/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/16/2018
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/22/2018
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/04/2018
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/04/2018
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/12/2018
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 06/28/2018
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 07/23/2018
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/23/2018
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/25/2018
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/25/2018
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/25/2018
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 07/26/2018
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/31/2018
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/31/2018
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 08/01/2018
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 08/01/2018
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 08/15/2018
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 08/15/2018
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 08/15/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 08/21/2018
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 08/22/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/04/2017 Referred to
09/12/2018 Discharged from
House Financial Services09/17/2018 Referred to
12/12/2018 Discharged from
House Administration09/17/2018 Referred to
12/12/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1050. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-337 (12/20/2018)

Chinese-American World War II Veteran Congressional Gold Medal Act

(Sec. 4) This bill directs the President pro tempore of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives to make appropriate arrangements for the award of a single Congressional Gold Medal to the Chinese-American Veterans of World War II in recognition of their dedicated service during World War II.

The medal shall be displayed at the Smithsonian Institution, which is urged to make the medal available for display at other locations associated with such veterans or with World War II.