There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

BENEFIT Act of 2017
Better Empowerment Now to Enhance Framework and Improve Treatments Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

BENEFIT Act of 2017
Better Empowerment Now to Enhance Framework and Improve Treatments Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to strengthen the use of patient-experience data within the benefit-risk framework for approval of new drugs.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S4788)
08/03/2017Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4787-4788)
05/04/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber
08/11/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
08/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
08/04/2017-1:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/03/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4788)
08/03/2017SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4787-4788)
05/04/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/04/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/04/2017 Referred to
08/03/2017 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce08/04/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health08/11/2017 Referred to

As of 11/18/2018 no related bill information has been received for S.1052 - BENEFIT Act of 2017.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1052. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (08/03/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Better Empowerment Now to Enhance Framework and Improve Treatments Act of 2017 or the BENEFIT Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to consider patient-focused drug development data, such as patient preferences, patient-reported outcomes, and patient experiences, as part of the risk-benefit assessment of new drugs. Following approval of a drug, the FDA must include a description of how this information was considered in its statement of patient experience.