There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend section 1214 of title 5, United States Code, to provide for stays during a period that the Merit Systems Protection Board lacks a quorum.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
06/27/2017Became Public Law No: 115-42. (TXT | PDF)
06/27/2017Signed by President.
06/15/2017Presented to President.
06/14/2017Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1083 by Unanimous Consent.
05/25/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H4591)
05/25/2017Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
05/11/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S2921)
05/11/2017Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2921)
05/10/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/27/2017Became Public Law No: 115-42. (TXT | PDF)
06/27/2017Signed by President.
06/15/2017SenatePresented to President.
06/15/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/14/2017SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1083 by Unanimous Consent.
06/05/2017SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
05/25/2017-11:50amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/25/2017-11:50amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H4591)
05/25/2017-11:50amHouseH.Amdt.125 On agreeing to the Hice, Jody B. amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
05/25/2017-11:49amHouseH.Amdt.125 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Hice, Jody B.. (consideration: CR H4591; text: CR H4591)
05/25/2017HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
05/25/2017-11:49amHouseMr. Hice, Jody B. asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H4591)
05/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
05/16/2017-2:09pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/15/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/11/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2921)
05/11/2017SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2921)
05/10/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 05/10/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/10/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/10/2017 Referred to
05/11/2017 Discharged from
House Oversight and Government Reform05/16/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.1083.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1083. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-42 (06/27/2017)

This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on May 25, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

This bill provides that if the Merit Systems Protection Board lacks the number of members required to constitute a quorum, any remaining member of the board may, upon request by the Special Counsel, extend the period of any stay of any personnel action granted.