There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the collection of voluntary feedback on services provided by agencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/07/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7068)
09/14/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-156.
05/10/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/08/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
11/08/2017-12:32pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/08/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/07/2017SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7068)
11/07/2017SenateS.Amdt.1580 Amendment SA 1580 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/07/2017SenateS.Amdt.1580 Amendment SA 1580 proposed by Senator Daines for Senator McCaskill. (consideration: CR S7067-7068; text: CR S7067-7068) To improve the bill.
11/07/2017SenateThe committee amendments agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
11/07/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7066-7068)
09/14/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 220.
09/14/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-156.
05/17/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
05/10/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 05/10/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/10/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
09/14/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-156
House Oversight and Government Reform11/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1088. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/07/2017)

Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill expresses the sense of Congress that all agencies should strive to provide high-quality, courteous, effective, and efficient services and seek to measure, collect, report, and utilize metrics relating to the experience of persons interacting with them to continually improve services.

(Sec. 4) The bill amends the Paperwork Reduction Act to exempt the collection of information by an agency that is voluntary feedback from the agency's authority to prescribe policies, rules, regulations, and procedures for federal information resources management activities. "Voluntary feedback" is defined as any submission of information, opinion, or concern voluntarily made by a specific person relating to a particular service of or transaction with an agency that is specifically solicited by that agency.

(Sec. 5) Each agency that solicits voluntary feedback shall, among other things, ensure that:

  • responses to the solicitation remain anonymous,
  • person who decline to participate shall not be treated differently by the agency for purposes of providing services or information,
  • the voluntary nature of the solicitation is clear, and
  • the proposed solicitation of voluntary feedback will contribute to improved customer service.

(Sec. 6) Each agency shall collect voluntary feedback with respect to its services and transactions. The Office of Management and Budget (OMB), in coordination with the General Services Administration, shall develop a set of standardized questions for use by agencies in collecting feedback, which shall address:

  • overall satisfaction of persons with the specific interaction or service received,
  • the extent to which such persons were able to accomplish their intended purpose,
  • whether such persons were treated with respect and professionalism, and
  • whether such persons believe they were served in a timely manner.

Each agency shall: (1) collect voluntary feedback across all platforms or channels through which it interacts with persons to deliver information or services, (2) publish on its website and submit to the OMB a report that includes the voluntary feedback required to be collected, and (3) regularly publish an aggregated report on the solicitation of voluntary feedback. The OMB shall maintain on a publicly available website links to the information provided on the agency websites.

(Sec. 7) The Government Accountability Office shall, by 15 months after the date on which all agencies have submitted the first annual reports and every 2 years thereafter until 10 years after such date, make publicly available and submit to Congress a scorecard report assessing the data collected and reported by the agencies.