There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of Energy to review and update a report on the energy and environmental benefits of the re-refining of used lubricating oil.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/10/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
11/29/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
05/10/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/10/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 05/15/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/06/2017
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/02/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 11/30/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN] 11/14/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/28/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/10/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy11/29/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1089. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/10/2017)

This bill directs the Department of Energy to update its report on the energy and environmental benefits of re-refining used lubricating oil and submit to Congress a strategic plan to increase the beneficial reuse of lubricating oil.