There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Pharmacy and Medically Underserved Areas Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for coverage under the Medicare program of pharmacist services.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/12/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/12/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/02/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 02/13/2017
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 02/16/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 02/17/2017
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/17/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/17/2017
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/13/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/24/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/25/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/27/2017
Sen. Strange, Luther [R-AL] 05/11/2017
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/16/2017
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/16/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/06/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/12/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/13/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 06/27/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 09/05/2017
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 09/19/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/25/2017
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 11/01/2017
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/27/2017
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 11/28/2017
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/19/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 03/19/2018
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 04/10/2018
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 07/25/2018
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 10/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance01/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.109. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/12/2017)

Pharmacy and Medically Underserved Areas Enhancement Act

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to provide for Medicare coverage and payment with respect to certain pharmacist services that: (1) are furnished by a pharmacist in a health-professional shortage area, and (2) would otherwise be covered under Medicare if furnished by a physician.