There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Supporting Grandparents Raising Grandchildren Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Supporting Grandparents Raising Grandchildren Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Supporting Grandparents Raising Grandchildren Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Supporting Grandparents Raising Grandchildren Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Supporting Grandparents Raising Grandchildren Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To establish a Federal Advisory Council to Support Grandparents Raising Grandchildren.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to establish a Federal Advisory Council to Support Grandparents Raising Grandchildren.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a Federal Task Force to Support Grandparents Raising Grandchildren.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
07/07/2018Became Public Law No: 115-196. (TXT | PDF)
07/07/2018Signed by President.
06/27/2018Presented to President.
06/21/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendments to S. 1091 by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4351)
06/13/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5131-5132)
03/22/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1977-1978; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S1977-1978)
03/12/2018Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/10/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/07/2018Became Public Law No: 115-196. (TXT | PDF)
07/07/2018Signed by President.
06/27/2018SenatePresented to President.
06/22/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/21/2018SenateSenate agreed to the House amendments to S. 1091 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4351)
06/14/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
06/13/2018-3:54pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/13/2018-3:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/13/2018-3:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5131-5132)
06/13/2018-3:45pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1091.
06/13/2018-3:45pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5131-5133)
06/13/2018-3:45pmHouseMr. Lewis (MN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/30/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/26/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/26/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/26/2018-4:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/23/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/22/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1977-1978; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S1977-1978)
03/12/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 343.
03/12/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
02/28/2018SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/10/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/10/2017 Referred to
02/28/2018 Markup by
03/12/2018 Reported by
House Education and the Workforce03/26/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/26/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/30/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1091. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-196 (07/07/2018)

Supporting Grandparents Raising Grandchildren Act

(Sec. 3) This bill establishes an Advisory Council to Support Grandparents Raising Grandchildren.

The council must identify, promote, coordinate, and publicly disseminate information and resources to help older relatives meet the needs of the children in their care and maintain their own health and emotional well-being.

The council must report on the information and resources.

The bill terminates the council after three years.