There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Department of Veterans Affairs Accountability and Whistleblower Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Veterans Affairs Accountability and Whistleblower Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Department of Veterans Affairs Accountability and Whistleblower Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Department of Veterans Affairs Accountability and Whistleblower Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Veterans Affairs Accountability and Whistleblower Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the accountability of employees of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/23/2017Became Public Law No: 115-41. (TXT | PDF)
06/23/2017Signed by President.
06/22/2017Presented to President.
06/13/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 368 - 55 (Roll no. 307).(text: CR H4884-4889)
06/06/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/24/2017Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Isakson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/11/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
06/23/2017Became Public Law No: 115-41. (TXT | PDF)
06/23/2017Signed by President.
06/22/2017SenatePresented to President.
06/13/2017-4:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/13/2017-4:36pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 368 - 55 (Roll no. 307). (text: CR H4884-4889)
06/13/2017-4:25pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4899)
06/13/2017-3:37pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on S. 1094, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Roe (TN) demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of S. 1094 until later in the legislative day.
06/13/2017-3:36pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H4896)
06/13/2017-2:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 1094.
06/13/2017-2:37pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2581 and S. 1094, with 1 hour of general debate for each bill. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except a motion to recommit with or without instructions on H.R. 2581, and a motion to commit on S. 1094. Both measures will be considered read and are closed to amendments.
06/13/2017-2:37pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 378. (consideration: CR H4884-4896)
06/13/2017-1:28pmHouseRule H. Res. 378 passed House.
06/12/2017-7:15pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 378 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2581 and S. 1094. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2581 and S. 1094, with 1 hour of general debate for each bill. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except a motion to recommit with or without instructions on H.R. 2581, and a motion to commit on S. 1094. Both measures will be considered read and are closed to amendments.
06/07/2017-5:33pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/07/2017-12:24pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/07/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/06/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/06/2017SenateThe committee substitute agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3261-3266)
06/06/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
05/24/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 103.
05/24/2017SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Isakson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/24/2017SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/17/2017SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-299.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/11/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/11/2017
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/15/2017
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 05/15/2017
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/15/2017
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/16/2017
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 05/16/2017
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/17/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 05/17/2017
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/18/2017
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/22/2017
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 05/22/2017
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/22/2017
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/22/2017
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/23/2017
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/23/2017
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/25/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 05/25/2017
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/25/2017
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 06/05/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/05/2017
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/05/2017
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/05/2017
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/05/2017
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 06/06/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/06/2017
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/06/2017
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/06/2017
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/06/2017
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/06/2017
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/06/2017
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 06/06/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/11/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Hearings by
05/24/2017 Markup by
05/24/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1094. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/11/2017)

Department of Veterans Affairs Accountability and Whistleblower Protection Act of 2017

This bill establishes in the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) the Office of Accountability and Whistleblower Protection, to be headed by the Assistant Secretary for Accountability and Whistleblower Protection.

The VA shall develop criteria to promote supervisory protection of whistle-blowers and provide supervisors with related training.

The bill revises VA authority to remove certain employees or senior executives for reasons of misconduct or performance, including by permitting such individuals to be demoted or suspended.

The VA: (1) shall reduce the federal annuity of a removed individual who is convicted of a felony that influenced his or her performance while employed in such position, and (2) may reduce the federal annuity of a retired individual who was convicted of such a felony but who left the VA before final action was taken.

The VA may recoup an award, a bonus, or relocation expenses paid to an employee under specified circumstances.

The VA may directly appoint medical center directors and Veterans Integrated Service Network directors.

The bill revises time periods for adverse action reviews with respect to physicians, dentists, podiatrists, chiropractors, optometrists, registered nurses, physician assistants, and expanded-function dental auxiliaries.

The VA shall: (1) assess the effect of the enactment of this bill on the hiring, promotion, retention, and productivity of individuals in senior executive positions; and (2) collect information on the outcomes and effectiveness of disciplinary actions carried out during the three-year period ending on the date of enactment of this bill.