There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Saving Federal Dollars Through Better Use of Government Purchase and Travel Cards Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Saving Federal Dollars Through Better Use of Government Purchase and Travel Cards Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Saving Federal Dollars Through Better Use of Government Purchase and Travel Cards Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the identification and prevention of improper payments and the identification of strategic sourcing opportunities by reviewing and analyzing the use of Federal agency charge cards.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
08/03/2017 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/11/2017 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-129.
05/11/2017 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
08/04/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
08/04/2017 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
08/04/2017-12:07pm House Received in the House.
08/03/2017 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2017 Senate S.Amdt.771 Amendment SA 771 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2017 Senate S.Amdt.771 Amendment SA 771 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Carper. (consideration: CR S4891; text: CR S4891)
08/03/2017 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4891)
07/11/2017 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 169.
07/11/2017 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-129.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
05/17/2017 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
05/11/2017 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/11/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 05/11/2017
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/07/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 06/13/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/11/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
07/11/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-129
House Oversight and Government Reform08/04/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (12)

  • Congressional oversight
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Fraud offenses and financial crimes
  • General Services Administration
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Government information and archives
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
  • Performance measurement
  • Public contracts and procurement
  • Transportation costs

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1099. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/03/2017)

Saving Federal Dollars Through Better Use of Government Purchase and Travel Cards Act of 2017

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to develop a strategy to expand the use of data analytics in managing government purchase and travel charge card programs for the purpose of:

  • identifying questionable transactions and developing enhanced tools and methods for agency use in identifying questionable transactions and recovering improper payments;
  • identifying potential opportunities for agencies to further leverage administrative process streamlining and cost reduction from purchase and travel card use;
  • developing a set of purchase and travel card metrics and benchmarks for high risk activities to assist agency purchase and travel card management and oversight activities; and
  • developing a plan to create a library of analytics tools and data sources for use by agencies.

(Sec. 4) The OMB must issue guidance on improving information sharing by government agencies, including by:

  • requiring relevant officials to identify and communicate information about high-risk activities;
  • requiring appropriate agency officials to review the reports issued by charge card-issuing banks on questionable transaction activity and suspicious timing or amounts of cash withdrawals or advances;
  • providing for the appropriate sharing of information related to potential questionable transactions, fraud schemes, and high risk activities with GSA and appropriate federal officials; and
  • considering the recommendations made by Inspectors General or the best practices Inspectors General have identified.

(Sec. 5) The GSA and the OMB must establish a purchase and travel charge card data management group to develop and share best practices.

(Sec. 6) The GSA shall report on: (1) the implementation of this bill, including the metrics used in determining whether the analytic and benchmarking efforts have reduced, or contributed to the reduction of, questionable or improper payments, as well as improved utilization of card-based payment products; and (2) further potential savings opportunities for government agencies under the federal charge card programs.

Each federal agency that issues and uses purchase cards and convenience checks shall report to the OMB on that agency's activities to implement this bill. The OMB must submit to Congress a consolidated report of agency activities to implement this bill.