There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Digital Coast Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Digital Coast Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Digital Coast Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of Commerce, acting through the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, to establish a constituent-driven program to provide a digital information platform capable of efficiently integrating coastal data with decision-support tools, training, and best practices and to support collection of priority coastal geospatial data to inform and improve local, State, regional, and Federal capacities to manage the coastal region, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/25/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3225-3226; text as passed Senate: CR S3225-3226)
03/30/2017Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-14.
01/12/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/26/2017-11:06amHouseHeld at the desk.
05/26/2017-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
05/26/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/25/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3225-3226; text as passed Senate: CR S3225-3226)
03/30/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 25.
03/30/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. With written report No. 115-14.
01/24/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/12/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 01/12/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/12/2017 Referred to
01/24/2017 Markup by
03/30/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-14

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.110. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (05/25/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Digital Coast Act

(Sec. 4) This bill requires the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to establish a constituent-driven Digital Coast program. (This program currently exists under NOAA to provide data, tools, and training that communities use to manage their coastal resources.) The program must: (1) provide an online resource that integrates geospatial data, decision-support tools, training, and best practices to address coastal management issues and needs, and to enhance resilient communities, ecosystem values, and coastal economic growth and development; and (2) provide for the documentation, dissemination, and archiving of the data.

NOAA must focus on filling data needs and gaps for critical coastal management issues and support continued improvement in existing efforts to coordinate the acquisition and integration of key data sets needed for coastal management, and other purposes. NOAA may: (1) enter into financial agreements and collect fees to carry out the program; (2) enter into contracts with private sector entities as may be necessary to collect, process, and provide remote sensing and other geospatial data and products.

Additionally, NOAA may establish publicly available tools that track ocean and Great Lakes economy data for each coastal state.