There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Women, Peace, and Security Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Women, Peace, and Security Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Women, Peace, and Security Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Women, Peace, and Security Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Women, Peace, and Security Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to ensure that the United States promotes the meaningful participation of women in mediation and negotiation processes seeking to prevent, mitigate, or resolve violent conflict.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/06/2017Became Public Law No: 115-68. (TXT | PDF)
10/06/2017Signed by President.
09/28/2017Presented to President.
09/25/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7447-7448)
08/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S4889-4891; text: CR S4889-4891)
06/08/2017Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. With written report No. 115-93.
05/16/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
10/06/2017Became Public Law No: 115-68. (TXT | PDF)
10/06/2017Signed by President.
09/28/2017SenatePresented to President.
09/25/2017-4:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2017-4:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7447-7448)
09/25/2017-3:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1141.
09/25/2017-3:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7446-7450)
09/25/2017-3:44pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/04/2017-2:31pmHouseHeld at the desk.
08/04/2017-1:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/04/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4889-4891; text: CR S4889-4891)
06/08/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
06/08/2017SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. With written report No. 115-93.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
05/25/2017SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Relations
05/16/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 05/16/2017
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/24/2017
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/24/2017
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/06/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/16/2017 Referred to
05/25/2017 Markup by
06/08/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-93

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1141. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-68 (10/06/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Women, Peace, and Security Act of 2017

(Sec. 3) This bill expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the United States should be a global leader in promoting the participation of women in conflict prevention, management, and resolution and post-conflict relief and recovery efforts; (2) the political participation and leadership of women in fragile environments, particularly during democratic transitions, is critical to sustaining democratic institutions; and (3) the participation of women in conflict prevention and conflict resolution helps promote more inclusive and democratic societies and is critical to country and regional stability.

(Sec. 5) The President, within one year after enactment of this bill and again four years later, shall submit to the appropriate congressional committees and make public a Women, Peace, and Security Strategy, which shall:

  • be aligned with other nations' plans to improve the participation of women in peace and security processes, conflict prevention, peace building, and decision-making institutions; and
  • include goals and evaluation plans to ensure strategy effectiveness.

Such a strategy shall include a specific implementation plan from each relevant federal agency.

The President is urged to promote women's participation in conflict prevention.

It is the sense of Congress that the President should: (1) provide technical assistance and training to female negotiators, peace builders, and stakeholders (non-governmental and private sector entities engaged in or affected by conflict prevention and stabilization, peace building, security, or related efforts); (2) address security-related barriers to women's participation; (3) encourage increased women's participation in U.S.-funded programs that provide foreign nationals with law enforcement, rule of law, or military education training; (4) support appropriate local organizations, especially women's peace building organizations; and (5) expand gender analysis to improve program design.

(Sec. 6) The Department of State shall ensure that personnel responsible for, or deploying to, countries or regions considered to be at risk of undergoing, or emerging from, violent conflict obtain training in the following areas, each of which shall include a focus on ensuring participation by women:

  • conflict prevention, mitigation, and resolution;
  • protecting civilians from violence, exploitation, and trafficking in persons; and
  • international human rights law.

The Department of Defense shall ensure that relevant personnel receive training in:

  • conflict prevention, peace processes, mitigation, resolution, and security initiatives that addresses the importance of participation by women; and
  • gender considerations and participation by women, including training regarding international human rights law and protecting civilians from violence, exploitation, and trafficking in persons.

(Sec. 7) The State Department and the U.S. Agency for International Development shall establish guidelines for overseas U.S. personnel to consult with stakeholders regarding U.S. efforts to:

  • prevent, mitigate, or resolve violent conflict; and
  • enhance the success of mediation and negotiation processes by ensuring the meaningful participation of women.

The State Department is urged to work with international, regional, national, and local organizations to increase the participation of women in international peacekeeping operations.

(Sec. 8) The State Department, within one year after the first strategy's submission, shall brief the appropriate congressional committees on training regarding the participation of women in conflict resolution.

The President, within two years after each strategy's submission, shall submit to the appropriate congressional committees a report that evaluates the implementation of such strategy and the impact of U.S. diplomatic efforts and foreign assistance programs to promote the participation of women.