There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Elie Wiesel Genocide and Atrocities Prevention Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Elie Wiesel Genocide and Atrocities Prevention Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Elie Wiesel Genocide and Atrocities Prevention Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Elie Wiesel Genocide and Atrocities Prevention Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Elie Wiesel Genocide and Atrocities Prevention Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to help prevent acts of genocide and other atrocity crimes, which threaten national and international security, by enhancing United States Government capacities to prevent, mitigate, and respond to such crises.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-441.
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019Presented to President.
12/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 367 - 4 (Roll no. 489).(text: CR H10546-10547)
12/12/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/27/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/17/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
01/14/2019Became Public Law No: 115-441.
01/14/2019Signed by President.
01/02/2019SenatePresented to President.
12/21/2018-4:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/21/2018-4:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 367 - 4 (Roll no. 489). (text: CR H10546-10547)
12/21/2018-4:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10574-10575)
12/21/2018-11:00amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/21/2018-10:58amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1158.
12/21/2018-10:58amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10546-10547)
12/21/2018-10:57amHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/13/2018-3:15pmHouseHeld at the desk.
12/13/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/13/2018-1:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
12/12/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/12/2018SenateS.Amdt.4102 Amendment SA 4102 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/12/2018SenateS.Amdt.4102 Amendment SA 4102 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Cardin. (consideration: CR S7523-7524; text: CR S7523) To make technical corrections.
12/12/2018SenateThe committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S7522)
12/12/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7522-7524)
06/27/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 489.
06/27/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/26/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/17/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3014-3015)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/17/2017 Referred to
06/26/2018 Markup by
06/27/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1158. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-441 (01/14/2019)

Elie Wiesel Genocide and Atrocities Prevention Act of 2018

This bill directs the Department of State to provide additional training for Foreign Service Officers assigned to a country experiencing or at risk of mass atrocities, such as genocide or war crimes. The training shall include instruction on recognizing patterns of escalation and early signs of potential atrocities, and methods of preventing and responding to atrocities.

The President shall report annually to Congress on U.S. efforts to prevent mass atrocities. The report shall cover topics including a review of current U.S. activities, funding expended on such activities, recommendations on how to strengthen such efforts, and the state of the implementation of the recommendations from the previous year's report.