There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.122. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/12/2017)

Mortgage Debt Tax Relief Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through 2018 the exclusion from gross income of income attributable to the discharge of indebtedness on a principal residence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/12/2017 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/12/2017 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Titles (3)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced:

Mortgage Debt Tax Relief Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced:

A bill to prevent homeowners from being forced to pay taxes on forgiven mortgage loan debt.


Subjects (3)

  • Housing finance and home ownership
  • Income tax exclusion

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/17/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/22/2017
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/05/2017
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/13/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance01/12/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 06/25/2017 no related bill information has been received for S.122 - Mortgage Debt Tax Relief Act.