There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Enhancing Veteran Care Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Enhancing Veteran Care Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Enhancing Veteran Care Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Enhancing Veteran Care Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to enter into contracts with nonprofit organizations to investigate medical centers of the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/20/2017Became Public Law No: 115-95. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2017Signed by President.
12/08/2017Presented to President.
12/06/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 661).(text: CR 12/5/2017 H9641-9642)
11/09/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S7166-7167)
11/09/2017Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7166-7167)
05/25/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/20/2017Became Public Law No: 115-95. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2017Signed by President.
12/08/2017SenatePresented to President.
12/06/2017-2:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/06/2017-2:36pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 661). (text: CR 12/5/2017 H9641-9642)
12/06/2017-2:25pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9684-9685)
12/05/2017-2:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/05/2017-1:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1266.
12/05/2017-1:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9641-9643)
12/05/2017-1:55pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/13/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
11/13/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/13/2017-2:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/13/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/09/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7166-7167)
11/09/2017SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7166-7167)
07/11/2017SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
05/25/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 05/25/2017
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/12/2017
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/12/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/25/2017 Referred to
07/11/2017 Hearings by
11/09/2017 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs11/13/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health11/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1266. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-95 (12/20/2017)

Enhancing Veteran Care Act

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to contract with a nonprofit organization that accredits health care organizations and programs in the United States to investigate a VA medical center to assess and report deficiencies of the center's facilities.

The VA shall delegate such authority to the Veterans Integrated Service Network (VISN) in which the medical center is located or to the director of such medical center.

Before entering into a contract, a VISN director or a medical center director shall notify the VA, the VA Inspector General, and the Government Accountability Office in order to coordinate an investigation conducted pursuant to such contract with any other ongoing investigations.