There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (9)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Hack DHS Act
Hack the Department of Homeland Security Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Hack DHS Act
Hack the Department of Homeland Security Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Hack DHS Act
Hack the Department of Homeland Security Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Hack DHS Act
Hack the Department of Homeland Security Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a bug bounty pilot program within the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
09/25/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-964.
04/17/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(text as passed Senate: CR S2224)
02/26/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-209.
05/25/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 752.
09/25/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-964.
09/13/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/13/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
04/18/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
04/18/2018-1:33pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/18/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/17/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text as passed Senate: CR S2224)
04/17/2018SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2224)
04/17/2018SenateS.Amdt.2238 Amendment SA 2238 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
04/17/2018SenateS.Amdt.2238 Amendment SA 2238 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hassan. (consideration: CR S2224; text: CR S2224) To improve the bill.
04/17/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2223-2225)
02/26/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 335.
02/26/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-209.
10/04/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/25/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 05/25/2017
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 05/25/2017
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 05/25/2017
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 11/16/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/25/2017 Referred to
10/04/2017 Markup by
02/26/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-209
House Homeland Security04/18/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Markup by
09/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-964

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1281. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (04/17/2018)

Hack the Department of Homeland Security Act of 2017 or the Hack DHS Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish, within the Office of the Chief Information Officer, a bug bounty pilot program to minimize vulnerabilities to DHS Internet-facing information technology.

A "bug bounty program" is a program under which an approved individual, organization, or company is temporarily authorized to identify and report vulnerabilities of Internet-facing information technology of DHS in exchange for compensation.

Under such program, DHS shall:

  • provide compensation for reports of previously unidentified security vulnerabilities within the websites, applications, and other DHS Internet-facing information technology that are accessible to the public;
  • award a competitive contract tomanage the pilot program and for executing the remediation of vulnerabilities identified bythe program;
  • designate mission-critical operations within DHS that should be excluded from the pilot program;
  • consult with the Department of Justice on how to protect from prosecution approved individuals or entities who comply with the requirements of the program;
  • develop an expeditious process for registration, background checks, and eligibility determinations for participation in the pilot program; and
  • engage interested persons about the structure of the program.

DHS must report to Congress on the program within 180 days of its completion.