There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

CBP HiRe Act
U.S. Customs and Border Protection Hiring and Retention Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

CBP HiRe Act
U.S. Customs and Border Protection Hiring and Retention Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

CBP HiRe Act
U.S. Customs and Border Protection Hiring and Retention Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide U.S. Customs and Border Protection with adequate flexibility in its employment authorities.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/10/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6774-6775; text: CR S6774-6775)
06/07/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-270.
06/07/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/12/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
10/12/2018-9:33amHouseReceived in the House.
10/11/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/10/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6774-6775; text: CR S6774-6775)
06/07/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 447.
06/07/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-270.
10/04/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/07/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3329-3330)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 06/07/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/07/2017 Referred to
10/04/2017 Markup by
06/07/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-270
House Oversight and Government Reform10/12/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1305. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/10/2018)

U.S. Customs and Border Protection Hiring and Retention Act of 2017 or the CBP HiRe Act

(Sec. 2) This bill provides hiring and compensation flexibilities to support the recruitment, relocation, and retention of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) employees in rural or remote areas.

Specifically, if the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) determines there is a critical hiring need and a direct relationship between the rural or remote nature of an area and the difficulty recruiting and retaining CBP employees in that area, then it may exercise direct hire authority and pay recruitment, relocation, and retention bonuses. Additionally, the Office of Personnel Management may establish special pay rates.

The DHS Office of Inspector General must review the use of hiring and compensation flexibilities and determine whether they help meet hiring and retention needs in rural and remote areas.

DHS must report to Congress on the number of requests it receives from other federal agencies for the file of an applicant for a position in the CBP that includes the results of a polygraph examination.