There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Abolish Human Trafficking Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Abolish Human Trafficking Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Abolish Human Trafficking Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Abolish Human Trafficking Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Abolish Human Trafficking Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide assistance in abolishing human trafficking in the United States.


Actions Overview (12)

Date
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-392. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/20/2018Presented to President.
12/17/2018Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment to S. 1311 by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7628; text: CR S7628)
09/28/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
09/28/2018Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
09/28/2018Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/28/2018Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
09/28/2018Committee on the Judiciary discharged.
09/11/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5175-5179)
08/01/2017Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/07/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (35)

Date Chamber
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-392. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/20/2018SenatePresented to President.
12/18/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2018SenateSenate agreed to House amendment to S. 1311 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7628; text: CR S7628)
10/01/2018SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
09/28/2018-12:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-12:34pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
09/28/2018-12:34pmHouseH.Amdt.975 On agreeing to the Marino amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2018-12:34pmHouseH.Amdt.975 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Marino. (consideration: CR H9377-9381; text: CR H9377-9381)
09/28/2018-12:33pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9373-9381; text of measure as introduced: CR H9373-9377)
09/28/2018-12:33pmHouseMr. Marino asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on Homeland Security discharged.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
09/28/2018HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
09/21/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/21/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/15/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/14/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
09/12/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/12/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/12/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/12/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/12/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/12/2017-5:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/11/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5175-5179)
09/11/2017SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
09/11/2017SenateS.Amdt.936 Amendment SA 936 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/11/2017SenateS.Amdt.936 Amendment SA 936 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Cornyn. (consideration: CR S5174-5175; text: CR S5174-5175) To improve the bill.
09/11/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5170-5179)
08/01/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 188.
08/01/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/29/2017SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/07/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3331-3335)

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/07/2017 Referred to
06/29/2017 Markup by
08/01/2017 Reported by
House Judiciary09/12/2017 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security09/21/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations09/21/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs09/12/2017 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce09/12/2017 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/15/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security09/12/2017 Referred to
09/28/2018 Discharged from
02/23/2018 Legislative interest
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security09/14/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1311. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/07/2017)

Abolish Human Trafficking Act of 2017

This bill sets forth a variety of measures to address the prevention and punishment of human trafficking and to assist trafficking victims. Included among these are provisions concerning:

  • restitution for victims;
  • funding of investigations of offenses relating to sexual abuse of children;
  • grants to states and localities and other entities for victim service assistance;
  • training of health, victim service, and federal law enforcement personnel, including through the use of a victim screening protocol by the Department of Homeland Security;
  • penalties imposed for slavery offenses, sex trafficking of children, and repeat convictions for transportation for illegal sexual activity and related crimes;
  • travel for the purpose of engaging in any illicit sexual conduct;
  • designation of additional Department of Justice resources for prosecution and service coordination;
  • penalties for offenses involving organized human trafficking, sexual abuse, sexual exploitation, or transportation for prostitution or any illegal sexual activity; and
  • studies of the physical and psychological effects of serious harm to victims.