There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Capitalizing on American Storage Potential Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Capitalizing on American Storage Potential Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to make certain strategic energy infrastructure projects eligible for certain loan guarantees, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/22/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 115-254.
06/12/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
05/22/2018Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 422.
Action By: Senate
05/22/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment. With written report No. 115-254.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/08/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
10/03/2017Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-318.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
06/12/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 06/12/2017
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/13/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/12/2017 Referred to
03/08/2018 Markup by
05/22/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-254

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1337. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/12/2017)

Capitalizing on American Storage Potential Act

This bill amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to expand the Department of Energy's existing loan guarantee program to any strategic energy infrastructure project that is a regional project which supports a more effective energy market performance and that has the potential to significantly contribute to the economic resilience of the region in which the project is located.