There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Spoofing Prevention Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Spoofing Prevention Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Spoofing Prevention Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to expand the prohibition on misleading or inaccurate caller identification information, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/03/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4817-4818; text: CR S4817-4818)
06/06/2017Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-91.
01/12/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/04/2017-2:32pmHouseHeld at the desk.
08/04/2017-1:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/04/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2017SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4817-4818; text: CR S4817-4818)
06/06/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 117.
06/06/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-91.
01/24/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/12/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S317-318)

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/12/2017
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 02/27/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/12/2017 Referred to
01/24/2017 Markup by
06/06/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-91

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.134. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/03/2017)

Spoofing Prevention Act of 2017

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the Communications Act of 1934 to expand the prohibition against knowingly transmitting misleading or inaccurate caller identification information to apply to: (1) persons outside the United States if the recipient of the call is within the United States, and (2) text messages.

Existing caller identification requirements that apply to calls made using a telecommunications service or IP-enabled voice service are revised to apply to: (1) services that furnish voice communications using resources from the North American Numbering Plan; and (2) transmissions from a telephone facsimile machine, computer, or other device to a telephone facsimile machine.

The Federal Communications Commission (FCC) must collaborate with the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) to regularly update education materials that help consumers identify: (1) scams and fraudulent activity that rely upon misleading or inaccurate caller identification information, and (2) existing technologies that consumers can use to protect against such fraud.

The Government Accountability Office must report on: (1) actions taken, or actions that could be taken, by the FCC or the FTC to combat the fraudulent provision of misleading or inaccurate caller identification information; and (2) any recommendations to combat the fraudulent provision of such information.