There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Apprenticeship and Jobs Training Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a tax credit for on-site apprenticeship programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/14/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
06/14/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3489-3490)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/14/2017
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/14/2017
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/21/2017
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/07/2018
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 05/21/2018
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 06/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance06/14/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1352. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/14/2017)

Apprenticeship and Jobs Training Act of 2017

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow employers a business-related tax credit for up to $5,000 for the training of a qualified individual in a qualified apprenticeship program or multi-employer apprenticeship program.

A "qualified individual" is an individual who: (1) is an apprentice participating in a qualified apprenticeship program or multi-employer apprenticeship program, (2) has been employed in either program for a period of at least seven months that ends within the taxable year, and (3) is not a highly compensated employee or a seasonal worker.

A "qualified apprenticeship program" is a program that: (1) provides qualified individuals with on-the-job training and instruction for a qualified occupation (i.e., a skilled trade occupation in a high-demand mechanical, technical, health care, or technology field); (2) is registered with the Office of Apprenticeship of the Department of Labor or a state apprenticeship agency recognized by the office; and (3) maintains records relating to the qualified individual.

A "qualified multi-employer apprenticeship program" is a program in which multiple employers are required to contribute and that is maintained pursuant to one or more collective bargaining agreements.

The bill also allows certain distributions, without penalty, from retirement and pension plans to an employee who is serving as a mentor. A "mentor" is a working individual who: (1) has attained age 55; (2) works reduced hours and engages in mentoring activities for at least 20% of such hours; and (3) is responsible for the training and education of employees or students in an area of expertise for which such individual has a professional credential, certificate, or degree.