There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Primary Care Enhancement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for the treatment of certain direct primary care service arrangements and periodic provider fees.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/14/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
06/14/2017Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/14/2017
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/27/2017
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 01/10/2018
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/07/2018
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 05/22/2018
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/04/2018
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/19/2018
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/26/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance06/14/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1358. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/14/2017)

Primary Care Enhancement Act of 2017

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) permit an individual to pay primary care service arrangement costs from a health savings account; and (2) allow an eligible taxpayer enrolled in a high-deductible health plan to take a tax deduction for cash paid into a health savings account, even if the taxpayer is simultaneously enrolled in a primary care service arrangement.

Under a "primary care service arrangement," an individual is provided coverage restricted to primary care services in exchange for a fixed periodic fee or payment for such services.

For the purposes of certain tax-deductible expenses for medical care, the bill expands the definition of "medical care" to include periodic provider fees paid for a defined set of medical services provided on an as-needed basis.