There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to revise the boundaries of certain John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System units in Delaware.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/23/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S471; text: CR S471)
09/07/2017Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 115-149.
06/21/2017Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/26/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/25/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/25/2018-4:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/24/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/23/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S471; text: CR S471)
09/07/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 214.
09/07/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 115-149.
07/12/2017SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/21/2017SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3688-3689; text of measure as introduced: CR S3689)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/21/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Environment and Public Works06/21/2017 Referred to
07/12/2017 Markup by
09/07/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-149
House Natural Resources01/25/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans01/26/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1395. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (01/23/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill modifies certain boundaries of the John H. Chafee Coastal Barrier Resources System Units located in Sussex County, Delaware.